+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2024; Chapter 0084; Effective 01/01/2025
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 10
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/23/2024); SJ 15
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 5
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/24/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 17 P. 5
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/24/2024 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/19/2024 01:00 pm LOB 202-204
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 10:30 am LOB 202-204
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 10 P. 227
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 5
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1