+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/10/2016; Chapter 0248; Effective 06/10/2016
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); SJ 20
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 58
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1556h, NT, MA, VV; 05/19/2016; SJ 18
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1556h: MA VV 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 14
- Amendment #2016-1556h: AA VV 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 14
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1556h (NT) for 05/11/2016 (Vote 15-0; CC) HC 29 P. 9
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/03/2016 10:20 AM LOB 306
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/19/2016 01:00 PM LOB 306
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/26/2016 11:00 AM LOB 306
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 04/05/2016 02:00 PM LOB 306
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Subcommittee Work Session: 03/30/2016 02:00 PM LOB 306
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/29/2016 10:00 AM LOB 306
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/22/2016 01:00 PM LOB 306
- Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 25 P. 118
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0855s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment 0855s, NT, AA, VV; 03/10/2016 SJ 8
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0855s, NT, 03/10/2016; SC9
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/13/2016, Room 101, LOB, 11:00 am; SC1
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor