+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- Lay SB422 on Table (Rep. Drye): MF DV 136-228 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 28
- Amendment # 2024-1697h: AA DV 337-28 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 28
- Amendment # 2024-1698h: AF DV 181-183 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 37
- Lay SB422 on Table (Rep. Weber): MF DV 179-186 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 45
- Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): MA DV 187-178 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 45
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 05/01/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC)
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am LOB 206-208
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 10:30 am LOB 206-208
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Judiciary HJ 11 P. 103
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1458s, AA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1458s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1458s, 04/11/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 14A
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/06/2024, Room 100, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 6
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1