+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/31/2024; Chapter 0039
- I. Section 2 Effective 01/01/2025
- II. Remainder Effective 05/31/2024
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 176
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/22/2024); SJ 15
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 5
On April 8, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/29/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 17 P. 5
On March 26, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/29/2024 01:00 pm LOB 202-204
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2024 09:30 am LOB 202-204
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 7 P. 110
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0819s, AA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0819s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0819s, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; SC 5
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor