+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0158; Effective 06/30/2024
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 38
On May 13, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/08/2024 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 20 P. 11
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/15/2024 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/08/2024 11:00 am LOB 205-207
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/01/2024 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 01:00 pm LOB 203
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 7 P. 110
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 6
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1