+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/16/2018; Chapter 0056; Effective 07/15/2018
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/10/2018
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1822e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/03/2018); SJ 17
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1822e: AA VV 05/03/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/19/2018 HJ 13 P. 10
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 16-0; CC) HC 15 P. 8
- Executive Session: 04/11/2018 LOB 301
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/03/2018 10:00 AM LOB 301
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 8 P. 70
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1011s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2018-1011s, AA, VV; 03/15/2018; SJ 8
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1011s, 03/15/2018; SC 12
On December 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 01/10/2018, Room 100, SH, 09:40 am; SC 49
On December 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 1