+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report: Not Filed
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/15/2018, 01:00 pm, Room 100, SH
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ohm, Major, Abrami, Lang 05/10/2018
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Major): MA VV 05/10/2018
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Giuda, Feltes; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
- Sen. Sanborn Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 05/02/2018; SJ 15
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1330h: MA VV 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 26
- Amendment # 2018-1330h: AA RC 170-165 04/12/2018 HJ 12 P. 24
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1330h for 04/12/2018 (Vote 12-11; RC) HC 14 P. 9
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1309h
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/03/2018 10:00 AM LOB 202
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/27/2018 11:00 AM LOB 202
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 03:00 PM LOB 202
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 7 P. 53
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1006s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/08/2018; SJ 6
- Committee Amendment # 2018-1006s, AA, VV; 03/08/2018; SJ 6
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1006s, 03/08/2018; SC 10A
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/17/2018, Room 100, SH, 09:20 am; SC 3
On December 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
April 12, 2018: Adopt Amendment
- Yeas: 170
- Nays: 165
- Present/NV: 20
- Absent: 37