+ − Actions (7)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 4
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 2 P. 59
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 01/30/2020; SJ 2
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; SC 4
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/14/2020, Room 100, SH, 02:20 pm; SC 2
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 2
+ − Vote
January 30, 2020: Ought to Pass
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Nay
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Nay
- John Reagan: Nay
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Martha Fuller Clark: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Nay
- Melanie Levesque: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Dan Feltes: Yea
- Harold French: Nay
- Martha Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Nay
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- David Starr: Nay
- Jeanne Dietsch: Yea
- Jon Morgan: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea