+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2024; Chapter 0256; Effective 07/19/2024
On July 2, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 47
On July 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2318e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 21, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2318e: AA VV (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 43
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2256c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 12
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2256c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
On June 6, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2256c Filed 06/06/2024; As Amended by the House HJ 15 P. 29
On June 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/05/2024, 11:00 am, Room 103, SH
On June 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==RECESSED== Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/03/2024, 02:00 pm, Room 100, SH
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Hunt): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 29
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Burroughs, Spier, Ammon 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 29
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Birdsell, Avard, Prentiss; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 36
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 25-0; CC) HC 20 P. 10
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/13/2024 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1641h (NT): AA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1641h: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 5
- Referred to Finance 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 5
- Division I Work Session: 05/08/2024 11:20 am LOB 212
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1641h (NT) 04/24/2024 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 17 P. 4
On April 15, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 03:15 pm LOB 302-304
- Executive Session: 04/24/2024 03:15 pm LOB 302-304
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2024 09:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 04/12/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 11 P. 103
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1422s, AA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1422s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
On April 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1422s, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 14
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0999s, AA, VV; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0999s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0999s, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; SC 6
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor