+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 31, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2024, Room 100, SH, 10:00 am; SC 6
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor