+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On October 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
On April 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 14A
On January 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 103, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 2
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Finance; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor