+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0181; Effective 01/01/2017
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); SJ 19
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/19/2016 HJ 39 P. 24
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 13
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 17-0; CC) HC 29 P. 8
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/26/2016 10:30 AM LOB 204
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/07/2016 10:30 AM LOB 204
- Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 27 P. 68
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/24/2016; SJ 10
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/24/2016; SC 11
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/14/2016, Room 100, SH, 01:45 pm; SC1
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor