+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/02/2019; Chapter 308; Effective 08/02/2019
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 56
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2632e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2632e: AA VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 53
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Watters Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/13/2019; SJ 20
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2161h: MA VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 5
- FLAM # 2019-2426h (Rep. Yokela): AF VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 5
- Amendment # 2019-2161h: AA VV 06/06/2019 HJ 18 P. 5
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2161h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 14-6; RC) HC 27 P. 19
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/21/2019 10:15 am LOB 201
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/15/2019 10:00 am LOB 201
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/30/2019 11:00 am LOB 201
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:30 am LOB 201
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways HJ 11 P. 69
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0201s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0201s, AA, VV; 02/14/2019; SJ 5
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0201s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 10
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, LOB, 01:30 pm; SC 7
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor