+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/01/2023; Chapter 0055; Effective 07/31/2023
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/18/2023
On May 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/18/2023); SJ 16
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 6
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/11/2023 (Vote 19-1; CC)
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/11/2023 11:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/30/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Ward Floor Amendment # 2023-0054s, AA, VV; 01/19/2023; SJ 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0054s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/19/2023; SJ 4
- Sen. Ward Moved to Remove SB 39 from the Consent Calendar; 01/19/2023; SJ 4
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 6
On January 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor