+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (4)
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 03/09/2017; SJ 8
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/09/2017; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 12
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/24/2017, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 7
- Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4