+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/30/2018; Chapter 0126; Effective 07/29/2018
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/03/2018
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); SJ 17
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/26/2018
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 23-0; CC) HC 16 P. 6
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/17/2018 10:00 AM LOB 205
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/11/2018 11:00 AM LOB 206
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/22/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 10 P. 52
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/22/2018; SJ 10
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/22/2018; SC 13A
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sen. Woodburn Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this Body: Rescind Order to the Committee on Finance, Reconsider the Vote on Ought to Pass with Amendment and Reconsider the vote on Floor Amendment 2018-1086s, MA VV; 03/15/2018; SJ 8
- Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2018-1086s, RC 13Y-11N, AA; 03/15/2018; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-0952s, and 2018-1086s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/15/2018; SJ 8
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0952s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2018-1086s, RC 12Y-12N, AF; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0952s, AA, VV; 03/14/2018; SJ 7
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0952s, 03/14/2018; SC 11
- Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, MA; 03/08/2018; SJ 6
- Sen. Kahn Moved to Remove SB 388 from the Consent Calendar; 03/08/2018; SJ 6
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0952s, 03/08/2018; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 10A
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/11/2018, Room 100, SH, 10:20 am; SC 48
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2018: Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment 1086s
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 24
March 14, 2018: Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1086
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 24