+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0078; Effective 05/27/2014
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled 05/01/2014
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-0; CC); HC 31
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/15/14 2:00 PM LOB 210-211
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 11:00 AM LOB 202
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Vacated to Ways & Means, MA VV
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0500s, MA, VV; OT3rdg
- Committee Amendment 0500s, AA, VV
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0500s, 2/19/14; SC7
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/11/14, Room 103, SH, 9:45 a.m.; SC6
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means