+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 10, 2024 in the House:
- Died on Table, Session ended 10/10/2024 HJ 17
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Lay SB386 on Table (Rep. Caplan): MA DV 348-11 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 82
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1558h (NT) 04/22/2024 (Vote 10-9; RC) HC 17 P. 26
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On April 17, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/22/2024 10:30 am LOB 302-304
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/22/2024 09:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 10 P. 227
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-1032s, AA, VV; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1032s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1032s, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/05/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:30 am; SC 9
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1