+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/31/2024; Chapter 0038; Effective 07/30/2024
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 176
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/22/2024); SJ 15
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 11
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/16/2024 01:00 pm LOB 301-303
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/16/2024 (Vote 14-0; CC) HC 17 P. 8
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/16/2024 01:00 pm LOB 301-303
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture HJ 10 P. 227
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/12/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:20 am; SC 10
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1