+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 9, 2024 in the House:
- Conferee Change: Rep. Drye Replaces Rep. Cordelli 06/02/2024 HJ 15 P. 35
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0286
- I. RSA 200:40-c I(h) Effective 08/01/2025
- II. Remainder Effective 08/01/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On June 13, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2024-2275c: Adopted, VV 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 10
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2275c, Adopted, VV; 06/13/2024; SJ 17
On June 6, 2024 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report # 2024-2275c Filed 06/06/2024; House Amendment + New Amendment HJ 15 P. 35
On June 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/05/2024, 9:00 a.m., Room 103, SH
On May 31, 2024 in the House:
- Conferee Change: Rep. Luneau Replaces Rep. Drye 05/31/2024 HJ 15 P. 34
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Ward Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
- President Appoints: Senators Lang, Gendreau, Prentiss; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Ladd): MA VV 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 29
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Ladd, Cordelli, Drye, Damon 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 29
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1596h: AA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1596h: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 8
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1596h 04/23/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 17 P. 7
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/22/2024 12:45 pm LOB 205-207
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/16/2024 10:15 am LOB 205-207
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Education HJ 10 P. 227
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 11
On January 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/18/2024; SJ 2
On January 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 3
On January 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 2
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor