+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/31/2024; Chapter 0037; Effective 07/30/2024
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 176
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/22/2024); SJ 15
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 192-170 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 34
On April 8, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 03/29/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC) HC 17 P. 16
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 03/29/2024 01:30 pm LOB 202-204
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/20/2024 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 6 P. 138
On January 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0149s, AA, VV; 01/18/2024; SJ 2
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0149s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; SJ 2
On January 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0149s, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 3A
On January 9, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 3
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor