+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/02/2018
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-7; RC) HC 17 P. 17
- Executive Session: 04/24/2018 LOB 306
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2018 11:00 AM LOB 306
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 8 P. 70
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0995s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0995s, AA, VV; 03/15/2018; SJ 8
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0995s, 03/15/2018; SC 12
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2018, Room 101, LOB, 09:20 am; SC 6
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor