+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/21/2024, Vote 3-2; SC 11
On January 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 3
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor