+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Indefinite Postponement (M. Smith) MF Div 179-183
- Reconsider (Rep. Ratzki) MF RC 172-192
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate MA RC 173-172 (Dep. Speaker presiding voted to break tie)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1390h
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-9; RC); HC 32
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 4/22/14 10:30 AM LOB 202
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/17/14 9:30 AM LOB 202 ==RECESSED==
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 4/16/2014 1:15 PM LOB 202
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 4/10/2014 9:00 AM LOB 202-204
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 4/15/2014 10:00 AM LOB 202
- Full Committee Work Session: 4/15/2014 10:00 AM LOB 202
- Public Hearing: 4/10/2014 10:00 AM LOB 202-204
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced (In Recess, 3/26/14) and Referred to Ways and Means
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- OT3rg
- Without Objection Rule 4-5 is Suspended to Allow SB 366 OT3rg.
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1179s, MA, RC 15Y-9N; SJ 8
- Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment #2014-1179s, AA, VV
- Committee Amendment 0279s, AF, VV
- Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Remove From Table, MA, VV; SJ 8
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; SJ 3
- Committee Amendment 0279s, Not Voted On; SJ 3
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0279s, 2/6/14; SC5
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 1/28/14, Room 103, SH, 9:30 a.m.; SC4
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2014: Reconsider
- Yeas: 172
- Nays: 192
April 30, 2014: ITL
- Yeas: 173
- Nays: 172
March 27, 2014: Ought to Pass with Amendment
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor