+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2016; Chapter 0154; Effective 05/27/2016
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/12/2016); SJ 18
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 128
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sen. Stiles Moved to Concur with House Amendment # 1223h, MA, VV; 04/28/2016;
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1223h: MA VV 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 43
- Amendment #2016-1223h: AA VV 04/20/2016 HJ 36 P. 43
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1223h for 04/20/2016 (Vote 12-2; RC) HC 24 P. 19
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/05/2016 02:30 PM LOB 203
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2016 11:00 AM LOB 203
- Introduced 03/10/2016 and referred to Transportation HJ 25 P. 118
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0836s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/10/2016; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment 0836s, AA, VV; 03/10/2016 SJ 8
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0836s, 03/10/2016; SC9
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/19/2016, Room 103, LOB, 01:00 pm; SC2
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor