+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/25/2018; Chapter 0315; Effective 08/24/2018
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2018
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sen. Reagan Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/10/2018; SJ 17
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1475h: MA VV 05/02/2018
- Amendment # 2018-1475h: AA VV 05/02/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1475h for 05/02/2018 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 17 P. 5
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/17/2018 09:30 AM LOB 207
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 11:30 AM LOB 207
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Education HJ 7 P. 50
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0064s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0064s, AA, VV; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0064s, 01/18/2018; SC 3
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, LOB, 09:10 am; SC 48
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Education; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor