+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- FLAM # 2024-1858h (NT) (Rep. Cushman): AA DV 184-181 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 24
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1858h: MA DV 338-28 05/09/2024 HJ 13 P. 24
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 05/01/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC)
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2024 09:45 am LOB 203
On March 27, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/03/2024 09:45 am LOB 203
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs HJ 7 P. 110
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/21/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 8
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1