+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1589h: AF DV 179-182 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 42
- Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Wilhelm): MA RC 185-176 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 42
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 04/23/2024 (Vote 10-10; RC) HC 17 P. 19
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/22/2024 10:00 am LOB 205-207
- Executive Session: 04/22/2024 12:45 pm LOB 205-207
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Education HJ 10 P. 229
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0786s, AA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0786s, RC 13Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, MA; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0786s, 04/05/2024, Vote 3-1; SC 13
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/21/2024, Without Objection, MA; 03/07/2024 SJ 6
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0786s, 03/21/2024, Vote 3-1; SC 11
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0786s, 03/07/2024, Vote 3-1; SC 9
On December 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 48
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor