+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0140; Effective 08/29/2023
On June 20, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 14
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1352h: AA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 14
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1352h: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 14
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1352h 04/19/2023 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/19/2023 11:30 am LOB 201-203
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/04/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; SJ 5
On January 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/26/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7
On January 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/18/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 6
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 4