+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 8
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/10/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 17 P. 6
On April 5, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/10/2024 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/26/2024 02:00 pm LOB 205-207
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Education HJ 6 P. 138
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0514s, AA, VV; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0514s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0514s, 02/15/2024, Vote 3-2; SC 7
On January 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 5
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor