+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective 06/16/14
- Signed by the Governor on 06/16/14; Chapter 0142; Effective 06/16/14
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV
On May 2, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; CC); HC 34
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/1/2014 10:30 AM LOB 210-211
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 4/10/2014 1:40 PM LOB 212
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 4/3/2014 1:30 PM LOB 212
- Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 11:15 AM LOB 210-211
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0522s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg
- Committee Amendment 0522s, NT, AA, VV
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0522s, NT, 2/19/14; SC7
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 1/21/2014, Room 103, SH, 1:00 p.m.; SC2
On January 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor