+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0280; Effective 07/01/2024
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- FLAM # 2024-2102h (Rep. D. McGuire): AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 63
- FLAM # 2024-2083h (NT) (Rep. Read): AF DV 164-195 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 63
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2102h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 64
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 25-0; RC) HC 20 P. 18
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/13/2024 01:00 pm LOB 210-211
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1427h: AA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1427h: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 12
- Referred to Finance 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 12
- Division I Work Session: 05/08/2024 10:00 am LOB 212
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/03/2024 10:00 am LOB 306-308
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1427h 04/03/2024 (Vote 10-1; CC) HC 17 P. 9
On March 27, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/03/2024 10:00 am LOB 306-308
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 6 P. 138
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/21/2024; SJ 5
On February 14, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2024, Vote 7-0; SC 8
On February 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0402s, AA, VV; 02/08/2024; SJ 3
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0402s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/08/2024; SJ 3
On February 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0402s, 02/08/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 6
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/03/2024, Room 103, SH, 01:15 pm; SC 49
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor