+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0213; Effective 07/01/2018
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/10/2018
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1951e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1951e: AA VV 05/10/2018
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/02/2018;
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1133h: MA VV 04/05/2018 HJ 11 P. 5
- Amendment # 2018-1133h: AA VV 04/05/2018 HJ 11 P. 5
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1133h (NT) for 04/05/2018 (Vote 11-0; CC) HC 13 P. 5
- Executive Session: 03/20/2018 LOB 208
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:00 AM LOB 208
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Judiciary HJ 7 P. 50
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0063s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0063s, AA, VV; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0063s, 01/18/2018; SC 3
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 100, SH, 10:45 am; SC 48
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor