+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2018
- I. Section 3 Effective 01/01/2019
- Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2018; Chapter 0283
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); SJ 18
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/23/2018
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, RC 12Y-10N, MA; 05/10/2018; SJ 17
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1607h: MA VV 05/02/2018
- Amendment # 2018-1607h: AA DV 239-90 05/02/2018
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1227h (NT)
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1607h (NT) for 05/02/2018 (Vote 11-8; RC) HC 17 P. 16
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/24/2018 11:00 AM LOB 306
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2018 02:00 PM LOB 306
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/10/2018 09:00 AM LOB 308
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/27/2018 02:00 PM LOB 203
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 7 P. 50
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0610s, RC 14Y-8N, MA; OT3rdg; 02/22/2018; SJ 5
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0610s, RC 13Y-9N, AA; 02/22/2018; SJ 5
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0610s, 02/22/2018; SC 8
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-0094s, RC 24Y-0N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
- Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, MA, VV; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
- Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2018-0094s; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
- Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
- Committee Amendment # 2018-0094s, AA, VV; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0094s, 01/18/2018; SC 3
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 101, LOB, 01:30 pm; SC 48
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (4)
May 10, 2018: Concur
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2018: Committee Amendment 0610s
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2018: Ought to Pass with Amendment
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 22
- Absent: 2
January 18, 2018: Ought to Pass with Amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor