+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0149
- I. Section 1 Effective 09/01/2024
- II. Remainder Effective 07/03/2024
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 3
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 20 P. 5
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 11:00 am LOB 302-304
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 6 P. 138
On January 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024; SJ 2
On January 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 3
On December 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:20 am; SC 49
On December 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 1