+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 20, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2024; Chapter 0080; Effective 08/13/2024
On May 30, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/30/2024 HJ 15 P. 10
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/23/2024); SJ 15
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 11
On April 18, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/16/2024 10:30 am LOB 301-303
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/16/2024 (Vote 14-0; CC) HC 17 P. 8
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/16/2024 10:30 am LOB 301-303
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture HJ 6 P. 138
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/15/2024; SJ 4
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 7
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 5
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1