+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On October 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On April 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0792s, AF, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Sen. Chandley Floor Amendment # 2024-1423s, AA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1423s, MA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Sen. Lang Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/11/2024; SJ 9
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, MA; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0792s, 04/11/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 14A
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Special Order to Next Session, Without Objection, MA; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0792s, 04/05/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 13
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. D'Allesandro Moved to Remove SB 328 from the Consent Calendar; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
- Special Order to 03/21/2024, Without Objection, MA; 03/07/2024 SJ 6
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0792s, 03/21/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 11
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0792s, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/16/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 2
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor