+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0278; Effective 01/01/2025
On July 15, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 51
On July 11, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 2, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1449h: AA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 16
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1449h: MA VV 05/02/2024 HJ 12 P. 16
On April 12, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1449h 04/10/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 17 P. 12
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/10/2024 11:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 13, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/20/2024 10:45 am LOB 206-208
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Judiciary HJ 7 P. 110
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 22, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 17, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 4
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor