+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 08/07/2018
- I. Sections 1 and 3 of this act shall take effect as provided in Section 4
- Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0212
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/10/2018
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); SJ 18
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1823e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 05/03/2018); SJ 17
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1823e: AA VV 05/03/2018
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 04/19/2018 HJ 13 P. 12
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/19/2018 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 15 P. 9
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/04/2018 LOB 304
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/04/2018 10:00 AM LOB 304
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 03/28/2018 01:30 PM LOB 304
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/20/2018 10:30 AM LOB 304
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 7 P. 50
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; SJ 2
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2018; SC 3
On December 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/09/2018, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 48
On December 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor