+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0147; Effective 09/01/2024
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 7
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 20 P. 8
On May 9, 2024 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 05/08/2024 10:30 am LOB 202-204
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/08/2024 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 05/01/2024 01:00 pm LOB 202-204
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2024-1647h: 05/01/2024 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/24/2024 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/19/2024 01:00 pm LOB 202-204
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 09:30 am LOB 202-204
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 10 P. 227
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0990s, AA, VV; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0990s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-0990s, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2024, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 5
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 1
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor