+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0146; Effective 07/01/2024
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 3
On May 16, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 20 P. 5
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/07/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/23/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 7 P. 110
On March 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; SJ 6
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 02/14/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; ; SC 7
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor