+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0154; Effective 09/26/2023
On June 30, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 16
On June 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 2
On May 25, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/10/2023 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/19/2023; SJ 4
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 6
On January 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:15 am; SC 5
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor