+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 14Y-10N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/21/2024, Vote 3-2; SC 11
On January 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/30/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 3A
On January 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 2
On December 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor