+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2016; Chapter 0180; Effective 08/02/2016
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); SJ 19
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/19/2016 HJ 39 P. 24
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 7
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/11/2016 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 29 P. 6
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/26/2016 01:15 PM LOB 302
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/19/2016 10:00 AM LOB 302
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/14/2016 01:15 PM LOB 302
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced 03/23/2016 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 27 P. 68
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0947s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/17/2016; SJ 9
- Committee Amendment 0947s, NT, AA, VV; 03/17/2016 SJ 9
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0947s, NT, 03/17/2016; SC 10
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/12/2016, Room 100, SH, 02:15 pm; SC1
On December 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/06/2016 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 1