+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On April 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this Body: Reconsider the Vote on Third Reading and Final Passage and Rescind Third Reading, MA VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/05/2024; SJ 8
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 6-0; SC 11
On February 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0664s, AA, VV; 02/21/2024; SJ 5
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0664s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/21/2024; SJ 5
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0664s, 02/21/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 8
On January 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 4
On December 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 01/04/2024, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 49
On December 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 1