+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On July 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/03/2024; Chapter 0145; Effective 07/03/2024
On June 25, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 HJ 16 P. 45
On June 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/13/2024); SJ 18
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 25
On May 10, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/08/2024 (Vote 20-0; CC) HC 20 P. 9
- Executive Session: 05/08/2024 10:00 am LOB 306-308
On April 26, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/08/2024 10:00 am LOB 306-308
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On April 2, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration HJ 10 P. 227
On March 21, 2024 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; SJ 7
On March 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024, Vote 5-0; SC 11
On February 15, 2024 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/21/2024, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 8
On December 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 1