+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sen. Forrester Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1665h; MA, VV; SJ 14
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1665h MA VV
- Amendment #2014-1665h AA VV
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1665h (Vote 23-0; CC); HC 35
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Rescheduled Executive Session: 5/8/2014 10:00 AM LOB 210-211
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 5/1/2014 2:30 PM LOB 212
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/1/2014 10:30 AM LOB 210-211=CANCELLED=
- Division I Work Session: 4/29/2014 1:00 PM LOB 212
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 4/22/2014 10:30 AM LOB 212
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 4/16/2014 1:00 PM LOB 212
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 4/10/2014 1:30 PM LOB 212
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 4/3/2014 1:00 PM LOB 212
- Public Hearing: 4/3/2014 10:30 AM LOB 210-211
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Finance
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0528s, 0589s, MA, VV; OT3rdg
- Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2014-0589s, AA, VV
- Committee Amendment 0528s, AA, VV
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0528s, 2/19/14; SC7
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 1/14/2014, Room 103, SH, 2:00 p.m.; SC2
On December 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Finance
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor