+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; SJ 1
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Sen. Watters Moved Laid on Table, RC 14Y-10N, MA; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/07/2019; SC 12
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- ==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, LOB, 11:30 am; SC 10
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 4
+ − Vote
March 7, 2019: Laid on Table
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor