+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/12/2019; Chapter 322; Effective 10/11/2019
On July 12, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 56
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2641e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2641e: AA VV 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 54
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Kahn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/13/2019; SJ 20
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment # 2019-1558h: AA VV 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1558h: MA VV 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 4
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1558h for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 22 P. 4
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am LOB 207
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 01:30 pm LOB 207
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education HJ 11 P. 72
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2019-1189s, AA, VV; 03/21/2019; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1189s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; SJ 9
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; SC 14
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0661s, AA, VV; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0661s, RC 24Y-0N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0661s, 03/07/2019; SC 12
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 10
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
March 7, 2019: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor