+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2023; SC 14
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/07/2023, Room 103, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 12
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 02/14/2023 and Referred to Finance; SJ 8